Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Kevin Boland

Bishop Emeritus of Savannah, Georgia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1935 Born
14 Jun 195924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Savannah, Georgia, USA
7 Feb 199559.7AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
18 Apr 199559.9Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
19 Jul 201176.2RetiredBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for John Kevin Boland
Bishop John Kevin Boland (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Savannah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonkstown, Ireland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Savannah.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,506

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast