Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Della Vedova

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

Titular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1875BornSpello
29 Aug 189722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Foligno, Italy
4 Feb 193357.9AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
19 Mar 193358.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
12 Apr 195075.1RetiredBishop of Tivoli, Italy
12 Apr 195075.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
24 Feb 195176.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Della Vedova:
Bishop Domenico Della Vedova (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013