Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Semedi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1921BornMala Kopanya
25 Jun 194725.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
6 Jul 194726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
24 Aug 197857.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
26 May 198361.9SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199169.5ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
12 Nov 200281.3RetiredBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
6 Dec 200887.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Ivan Semedi:
Bishop Ivan Semedi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,504
  • d: CB
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,229
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,446
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,950
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,263
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0: CB, 19 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 19 May 2015