Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor David García Osorio

Bishop of Yoro, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1966 Born
8 Nov 199731.1Ordained PriestPriest of Choluteca, Honduras
3 Jul 201447.7AppointedBishop of Yoro, Honduras
20 Sep 201447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yoro, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Héctor David García Osorio
Bishop Héctor David García Osorio (born ) Bishop of Yoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcepción de María

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • c2: CB, 12 Aug 2014
  • c34: CB, 20 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast