Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Pagano, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic of Harar, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Ficus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1954 Born
8 Sep 198127.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Apr 1988¹34.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Jun 198834.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Apr 201662.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Harar, Ethiopia
16 Apr 201662.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ficus
29 May 201662.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ficus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Pagano
Bishop Angelo Pagano O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Harar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsmara, Eritrea

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Harar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 29 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,927

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast