Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Eciru Oliach

Bishop of Soroti, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1970 Born
9 Aug 200332.9Ordained PriestPriest of Soroti, Uganda
19 Mar 201948.6AppointedBishop of Soroti, Uganda
25 May 201948.7Ordained BishopBishop of Soroti, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Eciru Oliach
Bishop Joseph Eciru Oliach (born ) Bishop of Soroti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGweri, Diocese of Soroti
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Father Hilder’s Primary School, Soroti, Diocese of Soroti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Soroti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 5 Apr 2019
  • c2: CB, 13 May 2019
  • c34: CB, 25 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 May 2019

Quantcast