Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel San Casimiro Fernández, O.A.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1942 Born
4 Sep 196421.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
3 Oct 196523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
25 Jul 199552.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica
7 Oct 199553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Quesada, Costa Rica
3 Jul 200764.7AppointedBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
1 Mar 201875.4RetiredBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Angel San Casimiro Fernández
Bishop Angel San Casimiro Fernández O.A.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela

EventPlace
Birth PlacePradejón, Spain
Ordained Bishopstade municipal Carlos Ugalde, Ciudad Quesada, Diocese of Ciudad Quesada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alajuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,619
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast