Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Lemmens

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Municipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1954Born
10 Jul 197723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hasselt, Belgium
22 Feb 201156.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
22 Feb 201156.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Municipa
3 Apr 201157.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Municipa
2 Jun 201763.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Léon Lemmens (VIAF: 172870997)
Bishop Léon Lemmens (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoorsem
Death PlaceLouvain

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,987
  • d: CB, 2 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017