Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Dixon Bhasera

Bishop of Masvingo, Zimbabwe

Apostolic Administrator of Gweru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1949 Born
19 Aug 197828.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 199141.5AppointedBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe
19 Oct 199141.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe
9 Feb 199949.2AppointedBishop of Masvingo, Zimbabwe
28 Apr 201262.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gweru, Zimbabwe
15 Jun 201363.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Gweru, Zimbabwe
24 Oct 201767.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gweru, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Michael Dixon Bhasera
Bishop Michael Dixon Bhasera (born ) Bishop of Masvingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGutu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Masvingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,552
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018