Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel 聲gel Mor嫕 Aquino

Bishop of Santa Ana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1955 BornEsqu甑ulas
5 Dec 198126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Ana, El Salvador
19 Jul 200045.1AppointedBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
2 Sep 200045.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
9 Feb 201660.7AppointedBishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Miguel 聲gel Mor嫕 Aquino
Bishop Miguel 聲gel Mor嫕 Aquino (born ) Bishop of Santa Ana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Ana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,828
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Feb 2016