Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Kockerols

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Ypres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1958 Born
18 Sep 199335.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
22 Feb 201152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
22 Feb 201152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ypres
3 Apr 201152.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ypres

MicroData Summary for Jean Kockerols (VIAF: 74181782)
Bishop Jean Kockerols (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrecht

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,988

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022