Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Joseph D’Amat de Volx

Deceased

Bishop of Senez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1713¹BornVolx
17 Apr 175744.2SelectedBishop of Senez, France
18 Jul 175744.5ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
18 Sep 175744.7Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
18 Mar 177158.2DiedBishop of Senez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Joseph D’Amat de Volx:
Bishop Antoine-Joseph D’Amat de Volx (born 1713, died ) Bishop of Senez

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015