Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucretius-Henri-François de La Tour du Pin Montauban

Deceased

Bishop of Riez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1705¹Born
3 Oct 175146.7SelectedBishop of Riez, France
20 Dec 175146.9ConfirmedBishop of Riez, France
23 Jan 175247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
28 Mar 177267.2DiedBishop of Riez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucretius-Henri-François de La Tour du Pin Montauban
Bishop Lucretius-Henri-François de La Tour du Pin Montauban (born 1705, died ) Bishop of Riez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllex

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast