Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul Faudoas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1750BornMiramont-Latour
1788¹37.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 180554.8SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
22 Mar 180554.9ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
21 Apr 180555.0Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
26 Sep 181969.4ResignedBishop of Meaux, France
3 Apr 182474.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Faudoas:
Bishop Jean-Paul Faudoas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 27 Jan 2015