Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Joseph Weisenburger

Bishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1960 Born
19 Dec 198726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
6 Feb 201251.1AppointedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
1 May 201251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
3 Oct 201756.7AppointedBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
29 Nov 201756.9InstalledBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Weisenburger
Bishop Edward Joseph Weisenburger (born ) Bishop of Tucson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlton, Diocese of Springfield in Illinois
Ordained PriestOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Cathedral, Oklahoma City, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Salina, Diocese of Salina, Kansas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tucson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,427
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast