Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Basil Taylor

Bishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1954 Born
2 Aug 198026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
10 Apr 200853.9AppointedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
5 Jun 200854.1Ordained BishopBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Basil Taylor (VIAF: 24304323)
Bishop Anthony Basil Taylor (born ) Bishop of Little Rock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFort Worth, TX, Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Church, Ponca City, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma
Ordained BishopStatehouse Convention Center, Little Rock, Diocese of Little Rock, Arkansas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Little Rock.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,755

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast