Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Bal

Bishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1963 Born
17 Dec 199128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
5 Jun 200743.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea
5 Jun 200743.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
10 Sep 200743.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
12 Jan 200945.1AppointedBishop of Kundiawa, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Anton Bal
Bishop Anton Bal (born ) Bishop of Kundiawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYuri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kundiawa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,507
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast