Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Sarego, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Goroka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1939 BornCologna Veneta, Italy
20 Aug 198647.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
6 Dec 199556.3AppointedBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
27 Apr 199656.7Ordained BishopBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
9 Jun 201676.8RetiredBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sarego
Bishop Francesco Sarego S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Goroka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goroka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,715
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Jun 2016