Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pudhota Chinniah Balaswamy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nellore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1928Born
24 Apr 195526.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 197345.1AppointedBishop of Nellore, India
19 Mar 197445.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nellore, India
7 Dec 200678.1RetiredBishop of Nellore, India
24 Sep 200980.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nellore, India

MicroData Summary for Pudhota Chinniah Balaswamy
Bishop Pudhota Chinniah Balaswamy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nellore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValarpuram

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2006
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast