Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Prakash Mallavarapu

Archbishop of Visakhapatnam, India

Apostolic Administrator of Srikakulam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1949 Born
11 Oct 197930.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 199849.3AppointedBishop of Cuddapah, India
22 Jul 199849.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cuddapah, India
26 Jul 200253.4AppointedBishop of Vijayawada, India
3 Jul 201263.4AppointedArchbishop of Visakhapatnam, India
2 Jan 201969.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Srikakulam, India

MicroData Summary for Prakash Mallavarapu
Archbishop Prakash Mallavarapu (born ) Archbishop of Visakhapatnam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJadi-Jamalpur
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Mariapuram, Cuddapah, Diocese of Cuddapah

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Visakhapatnam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,359
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2012
  • ab: CB, 2 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2019

Quantcast