Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Célestin-Marie Gaoua

Bishop of Sokodé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1957 BornWahala
27 Dec 198629.7Ordained PriestPriest of Atakpamé, Togo
3 Jan 201658.7AppointedBishop of Sokodé, Togo
5 Mar 201658.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sokodé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Célestin-Marie Gaoua
Bishop Célestin-Marie Gaoua (born ) Bishop of Sokodé

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sokodé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2016
  • c2: CB, 4 Mar 2016
  • c34: CB, 5 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016