Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Danka Longa

Bishop of Kara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1961 BornSokodé
25 Jan 199230.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sokodé, Togo
1 Jul 199432.9IncardinatedPriest of Kara, Togo
23 Apr 200846.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kara, Togo
26 Jul 200847.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kara, Togo
7 Jan 200947.4SucceededBishop of Kara, Togo

MicroData Summary for Jacques Danka Longa:
Bishop Jacques Danka Longa (born ) Bishop of Kara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,934
  • s: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013