Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Piazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1907BornCasalbuttano
26 Mar 193224.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 195042.9AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
1 Oct 195043.1Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
1 Oct 195346.1AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
5 Aug 196355.9DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Piazzi:
Bishop Giuseppe Piazzi (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1950, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013