Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henrique Hector Golland Trindade, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1897BornPôrto Alegre
18 Dec 192629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Mar 194143.8AppointedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
8 Jun 194144.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
15 May 194851.0AppointedBishop of Botucatu, Brazil
19 Apr 195860.9AppointedArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Mar 196870.8ResignedArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Mar 196870.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lilybaeum
16 Mar 197173.8ResignedTitular Archbishop of Lilybaeum
6 Nov 197477.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique Hector Golland Trindade:
Archbishop Henrique Hector Golland Trindade O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014