Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria Parreira Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1886BornVilla Rezende Costa
18 Apr 191124.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 192437.8AppointedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
18 Dec 192438.5AppointedBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Feb 192538.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Sep 193448.3AppointedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Aug 193650.2DiedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Maria Parreira Lara:
Bishop José Maria Parreira Lara (born , died ) Bishop of Caratinga

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013