Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jésus Rocha

Deceased

Bishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1939BornDiamantina
1 Jan 196626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
1 Dec 199354.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
1 Dec 199354.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutia
26 Feb 199454.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutia
20 Oct 200465.0AppointedBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
13 Jul 200666.7DiedBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jésus Rocha:
Bishop Jésus Rocha (born , died ) Bishop of Oliveira

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,253
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013