Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo de Miranda Pereira

Bishop Emeritus of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1936 Born
8 Dec 195923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 May 198649.9AppointedBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Aug 198650.1Ordained BishopBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Nov 201276.4RetiredBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Leonardo de Miranda Pereira
Bishop Leonardo de Miranda Pereira (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Paracatu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiamantina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paracatu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,244
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2012
  • c1: Website of the Diocese, 27 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast