Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geraldo do Espírito Santo Ávila

Deceased

Archbishop of Brazil, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1929BornDatas
29 Nov 195324.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 197748.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
27 Jun 197748.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
3 Sep 197748.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
31 Oct 199061.6AppointedArchbishop of Brazil, Military
12 Dec 199061.7InstalledArchbishop of Brazil, Military
7 Mar 199868.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
29 Jul 199869.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
19 May 199970.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
14 Nov 200576.6DiedArchbishop of Brazil, Military

MicroData Summary for Geraldo do Espírito Santo Ávila:
Archbishop Geraldo do Espírito Santo Ávila (born , died ) Archbishop of Brazil, Military

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2000
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013