Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pacifico Giulio Vanni, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Proconnesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1893Born
14 Mar 192026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jun 193238.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sianfu, China
14 Jun 193238.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zapara
23 Oct 193239.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zapara
11 Apr 194652.5AppointedArchbishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China
10 May 195258.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
13 Jul 196369.8ResignedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
13 Jul 196369.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Proconnesus
26 Jun 196773.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Giulio Vanni
Archbishop Pacifico Giulio Vanni O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sovana e Pitigliano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontaione, Diocese of Volterra
Ordained BishopHankow
Death PlaceFiesole, Diocese of Fiesole

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 72
  • 3p17/c1: MW, 2 Mar 2019
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast