Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Simonetti

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1861Born
21 Mar 188524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
16 Dec 190746.8AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
9 Jan 190846.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
14 Aug 195089.5DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Simonetti
Bishop Angelo Simonetti (born , died ) Bishop of Pescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornacchiaia
Ordained BishopCastelli, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,881

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast