Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João de Sousa

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1647³Born
16 Dec 168336.6AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
16 Apr 168437.0Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
24 Sep 169649.4AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
1 Oct 170356.4AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal
29 Sep 171063.4DiedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João de Sousa
Archbishop João de Sousa (born , died ) Archbishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Archdiocese of Lisboa

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126, and Page 322
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 4
  • bd/d: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,593, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast