Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nuno Cardinal da Cunha e Ataíde

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1664Born
14 Dec 170541.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
14 Mar 170641.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa
18 May 171247.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 172156.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
3 Dec 175085.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

MicroData Summary for Nuno da Cunha e Ataíde
Nuno Cardinal da Cunha e Ataíde (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopRoyal Palace, Chapel, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a bishop for 44.7 years
  • a cardinal for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 2
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 831
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast