Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

Archidioecesis Pechimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Li Shan, Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 30,000 (11,587 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Si-She-Ku, Beijing, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Peking [Beijing]
10 April 1690ErectedDiocese of Macau Diocese of Peking [Beijing] (erected)
1696Territory LostDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi (erected)
9 September 1831Territory LostDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Corea (erected)
16 August 1838Territory LostDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Liaotung (erected)
3 September 1839Territory LostDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong) (erected)
2 April 1856Territory LostDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale} (erected)
30 May 1856Territory LostDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin
30 May 1856Name ChangedDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin
14 February 1910Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin Vicariate Apostolic of Central Chi-Li {Ce-Li Centrale} (erected)
27 April 1912Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin Vicariate Apostolic of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin Vicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]
10 May 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Süanhwafu (erected)
25 May 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Paotingfu
Vicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Yihsien [Yixian] (erected)
Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing] Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
1949215,91580391191,81440030075ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast