Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward John Galvin, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1882Born
20 Jun 190926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
191734.1ProfessedPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
1 Nov 192441.9AppointedPrefect of Hanyang [Hanyang], China
16 Jul 192744.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
16 Jul 192744.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hanyang [Hanyang], China
6 Nov 192744.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
11 Apr 194663.3AppointedBishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China
23 Feb 195673.2DiedBishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China

MicroData Summary for Edward John Galvin
Bishop Edward John Galvin S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Hanyang [Hanyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrookstown, Diocese of Cork, Ireland
Ordained PriestCollege Church, Maynooth
Ordained BishopHanyang
Death PlaceNavan, Ireland

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 70
  • opd: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019
  • c1: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast