Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Epiphane Carlassare, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale}, China

Titular Bishop of Madaurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1844Born
21 Dec 186521.4ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
21 Dec 186622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
18 Jul 188440.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale}, China
18 Jul 188440.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
14 Sep 188440.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
24 Jul 190965.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale}, China

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Epiphane Carlassare (VIAF: 209259153)
Bishop Vincenzo Epiphane Carlassare O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontecchio Maggiore, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Ordained BishopHankow
Death PlaceTzen-tao

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 358
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 44
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 923

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast