Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

Archidioecesis Singanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Anthony Dang Mingyan, Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 12,000 (4,635 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Tu-Ti-Miao, Xi'an, Shaanxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale}
12 April 1911ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sianfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Sianfu
28 March 1928Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Hanchung [Hanzhong] (Hanchungfu) (Tze-yang, Pingli, Ning-shen, Shig-chuan, Sun-yang, Han-yin, Chuan-ping, Pai-ho, and Hinganfu (or An-kang))
Vicariate Apostolic of Sianfu (Siao-yi, Chen-an, and Shan-yang)
Prefecture Apostolic of Ankang [Hinganfu] (erected)
1 November 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sianfu (SanyŁan, Changwu, Sanshui, Tungkwan, Pinchow, Yaochow, Chunhwa, Yungshow, Fuping, Kienchow, Lichiian, Wukung, Hingping, Sienyang, Kingyang, and Kaoling) Prefecture Apostolic of SanyŁan [Sanyuan] (erected)
3 November 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sianfu (Tungchow, Hangeheng, Tengeheng, Peishui, Pucheng, Chaoyi, Pinmin, Weinan, Hwachow, Hwayin, Hoyang, and Tungkwan) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tungchow [Tongzhou] (erected)
17 June 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sianfu (Chouchih, Shingping, Hushien, Wukung, Fufeng, and Meishien) Prefecture Apostolic of Chowchich [Zhouzhi] (erected)
15 November 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sianfu (Fong-siang, Lungchow, Kiengyang, Linyn, Paoki, and Kishan) Prefecture Apostolic of Fengsiang [Fengxiang] (erected)
Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sianfu Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
195013,3941,500,000.9%8132163714415ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Sianfu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 23, to Page 25
  • Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 301, to Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024