Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Veríssimo Cardinal de Lencastre

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1615Born
22 Dec 167055.1AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
Jun 1671²55.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
8 Feb 167761.2ResignedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
2 Sep 168670.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 169277.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Veríssimo de Lencastre (VIAF: 89111934)
Veríssimo Cardinal de Lencastre (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,571
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 21
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,593, Ascendance
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,965

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast