Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo X

Giovanni de’ Medici

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1475Born
9 Mar 148913.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
23 Mar 148913.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
26 Mar 149216.2Elevated to Cardinal
9 Mar 151337.2ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
15 Mar 151337.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 151337.2Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Mar 151337.2InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Dec 152145.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de’ Medici (VIAF: 96579640)
Pope Giovanni de’ Medici (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopLateran Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 8.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
  • a cardinal for 24.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,625
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 3
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Ascendance
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast