Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Patrick Mahoney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Ipagro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1925Born
19 May 195125.7Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
25 Jul 197246.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
25 Jul 197246.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ipagro
15 Sep 197247.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ipagro
10 May 199771.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
1 Jun 200276.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for James Patrick Mahoney
Bishop James Patrick Mahoney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKingston
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 987
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast