Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Dennis Head

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1919Born
27 Jan 194525.4Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
27 Jan 197050.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
27 Jan 197050.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Sratha
19 Mar 197050.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Árd Sratha
23 Jan 197353.4AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
19 Mar 197353.6InstalledBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
18 Apr 199575.7RetiredBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
29 Mar 200585.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Dennis Head
Bishop Edward Dennis Head (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhite Plains
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 455
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast