Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Jerome Killeen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Military, USA

Titular Bishop of Vamalla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1917Born
30 May 194224.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 197558.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Military, USA
4 Nov 197558.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vamalla
13 Dec 197558.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vamalla
8 Sep 197861.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Military, USA

MicroData Summary for James Jerome Killeen
Bishop James Jerome Killeen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, New York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,995
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast