Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Francis Mestice

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Villa Nova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1923Born
4 Jun 194925.4Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
5 Mar 197349.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
5 Mar 197349.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Nova
27 Apr 197349.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Nova
30 Oct 200177.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
29 Apr 201187.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Francis Mestice
Bishop Anthony Francis Mestice (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,171
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast