Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael Fearns

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Geras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1897Born
19 Feb 192224.6Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
4 Nov 195760.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
4 Nov 195760.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
10 Dec 195760.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
12 Aug 197275.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
4 Jul 197780.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Michael Fearns
Bishop John Michael Fearns (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast