Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Basile Mvé Engone, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Libreville, Gabon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1941 Born
29 Jun 197332.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Apr 198038.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oyem, Gabon
24 Aug 198039.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Oyem, Gabon
23 Aug 198241.2SucceededBishop of Oyem, Gabon
3 Apr 199856.8AppointedArchbishop of Libreville, Gabon
4 Apr 201674.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Franceville, Gabon
13 Jan 201876.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Franceville, Gabon
12 Mar 202078.7RetiredArchbishop of Libreville, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Basile Mvé Engone
Archbishop Basile Mvé Engone S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Libreville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNkolmelène

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Libreville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Apr 2020

Quantcast