Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Patrick Iba-Ba

Archbishop of Libreville, Gabon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1966 Born
19 Jul 199832.2Ordained PriestPriest of Libreville, Gabon
4 Nov 201751.5AppointedBishop of Franceville, Gabon
13 Jan 201851.7Ordained BishopBishop of Franceville, Gabon
12 Mar 202053.9AppointedArchbishop of Libreville, Gabon
12 Apr 202053.9InstalledArchbishop of Libreville, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Patrick Iba-Ba
Archbishop Jean-Patrick Iba-Ba (born ) Archbishop of Libreville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLibreville, Archdiocese of Libreville
Ordained BishopGrand Stade, Franceville, Diocese of Franceville

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Libreville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 25 Nov 2017
  • c2: CB, 13 Jan 2018
  • c34: CB, 13 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,662
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2020
  • i: CB, 13 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast