Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ronald Aldon Hicks

Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1967 Born
21 May 199426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 201850.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 201850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
17 Sep 201851.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
17 Jul 202052.9AppointedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
29 Sep 202053.1InstalledBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Ronald Aldon Hicks
Bishop Ronald Aldon Hicks (born ) Bishop of Joliet in Illinois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained PriestHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Joliet in Illinois.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 20 Aug 2018
  • mn: CB, 24 Aug 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,853
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast