Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Musarò

Apostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica

Titular Archbishop of Abari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1948 Born
19 Sep 197123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Otranto, Italy
3 Dec 199446.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Abari
3 Dec 199446.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
6 Jan 199546.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Abari
25 Sep 199951.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Madagascar
25 Sep 199951.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Comoros
25 Sep 199951.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Seychelles
25 Sep 199951.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mauritius
10 Feb 200455.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
5 Jan 200960.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
6 Aug 201163.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba
5 Feb 201566.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
29 Aug 201971.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Bruno Musarò
Archbishop Bruno Musarò (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Costa Rica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndrano, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Costa Rica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,456
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 11 Jan 2021

Quantcast