Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Pierre Marie Cattenoz

Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon, France

Note/Previous Titular See: (Institut Notre Dame de Vie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1945 Born
4 Jul 198236.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
29 May 198337.4Ordained PriestPriest of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
21 Jun 200256.5AppointedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
13 Oct 200256.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
11 Jan 202175.0RetiredArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Marie Cattenoz (VIAF: 27134008)
Archbishop Jean-Pierre Marie Cattenoz (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaxeville, Meurthe et Moselle
Ordained BishopParc des Expositions, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Avignon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,277
  • od: CB, 5 May 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 11 Jan 2021

Quantcast