Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Armando Álvarez Cano

Bishop of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1960 Born
8 Feb 198626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
3 Nov 201151.7AppointedPrelate of Huautla, Oaxaca, México
30 Jan 201252.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Huautla, Oaxaca, México
11 May 201959.2AppointedBishop of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México
5 Jul 201959.4InstalledBishop of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for José Armando Álvarez Cano
Bishop José Armando Álvarez Cano (born ) Bishop of Tampico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJiquilpan, Diocese of Zamora, Michoacán
Ordained BishopCathedral, Huautla, Territorial Prelature of Huautla, Oaxaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tampico.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,249
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 May 2019
  • i: CB, 18 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast