Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Sodano

Dean Emeritus of the College of Cardinals

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1927 Born
23 Sep 195022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Asti, Italy
30 Nov 197750.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nova Caesaris
30 Nov 197750.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
15 Jan 197850.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nova Caesaris
23 May 198860.5AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
1 Mar 198961.2AppointedSecretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State
1 Dec 199063.0AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
28 Jun 199163.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
28 Jun 199163.5Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 199163.5AppointedSecretary of State
10 Jan 199466.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
2 Oct 199466.8InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Albano
27 Nov 200275.0ElectedVice-Dean (Sub-Dean) of the College of Cardinals
30 Nov 200275.0ConfirmedVice-Dean (Sub-Dean) of the College of Cardinals
2 Apr 200577.3CeasedSecretary of State
21 Apr 200577.4ConfirmedSecretary of State
27 Apr 200577.4ElectedDean of the College of Cardinals
30 Apr 200577.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
30 Apr 200577.4ConfirmedDean of the College of Cardinals
10 Jul 200577.6InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
15 Sep 200678.8RetiredSecretary of State
21 Dec 201992.0CeasedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
21 Dec 201992.0RetiredDean of the College of Cardinals

MicroData Summary for Angelo Sodano (VIAF: 85457471)
Angelo Cardinal Sodano (born ) Dean Emeritus of College of Cardinals

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola d'Asti, Diocese of Asti, Italy
Ordained PriestAsti, Diocese of Asti, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Secondo, Cathedral, Asti, Diocese of Asti, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the College of Cardinals.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,086
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast